FENLAND COUNCIL FOR VOLUNTARY SERVICE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing information and support services to Voluntary and Community groups based in Fenland.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 28 June 2004: Standard registration
- 09 October 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- FENLAND CVS (Working name)
- FENLAND COUNCIL FOR VOLUNTARY SERVICES (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £107.49k | £160.73k | £117.63k | £128.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £103.26k | £155.29k | £111.64k | £129.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 30 September 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 30 September 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 17 September 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 17 September 2008 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19 FEBRUARY 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 20 APRIL 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 1 MARCH 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 16 SEPTEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT DISTRICT OF FENLAND AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS; B) TO PROMOTE AND ORGANISE CO-OPERATION IN THE ACHIEVEMENT OF THE ABOVE PURPOSES AND TO THAT END TO BRING TOGETHER IN COUNCIL REPRESENTATIVES OF THE VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND STATUTORY AUTHORITIES WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT
Area of benefit
IN THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT DISTRICT OF FENLAND AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window