ALLIANCE FOR COMMUNITY CAPACITY - BUILDING IN NORTHEAST INDIA

Charity number: 1106666
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 05 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 04 October 2020 157 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 08 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 23 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2016 05 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required