ALLIANCE FOR COMMUNITY CAPACITY - BUILDING IN NORTHEAST INDIA

Charity number: 1106666
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £1.37k £1.32k £1.32k £2.05k £2.18k
Total expenditure £2.29k £164 £500 £435 £850
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A