UGANDA COMMUNITY RELIEF ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1106996
Charity reporting is up to date (50 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 March 2021 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 22 March 2021 50 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 30 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 22 February 2019 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 22 February 2019 22 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 30 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 30 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 10 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 10 January 2017 On time Download