Trustees LITTLE SWANS (NORFOLK)

Charity number: 1104647
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Tara Frascogna Chair 30 October 2019
None on record
Amber Scott-Curtis Trustee 12 November 2019
None on record
Julia Cole Trustee 07 February 2019
None on record
KAYLEIGH SMITH Trustee 30 October 2017
None on record
GEORGE NORTHALL Trustee 02 September 2011
None on record