IXIA PA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ixia is the national think tank for public art practice, funded by Arts Council England. It's aim is to provide an independent & objective view of the factors that affect the quality of artists' work in the public realm by undertaking research and enabling debate. It transfers knowledge through publications, consultancy, conferences and training.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £25,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 27 October 2004: Standard registration
- PUBLIC ART THINK TANK (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katherine Beinart | Trustee | 16 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Freshwater | Trustee | 16 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jane Gray | Trustee | 16 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Heath | Trustee | 15 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE LARA NEWBERY | Trustee | 19 July 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £11.25k | £6.15k | £25.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £792 | £239 | £2.19k | £15.09k | £5.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £11.25k | N/A | £25.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 JANUARY 2003 AS AMENDED BY WRITTEN RESOLUTIONS DATED 23 SEPTEMBER 2004 AND 1 OCTOBER 2004.
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS, PARTICULARLY VISUAL ARTS AND IN PARTICULAR WORKS OF ART AND CRAFT IN PUBLIC PLACES; 2. TO PROMOTE THE ARTS IN ALL THEIR RESPECTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, PARTICULARLY VISUAL ARTS {AND IN PARTICULAR WORKS OF ART AND CRAFT IN PUBLIC PLACES}.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE ENGLAND, WALES, SCOTLAND, NORTHERN IRELAND AND EIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sylcote
Torpenhow
Wigton
CA7 1JF
- Phone:
- 07770714103
- Email:
- ixiapublicart@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window