THE PALLIATIVE CARE RESEARCH SOCIETY

Charity number: 1104701
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £7.85k £5.04k £53.68k £5.11k £5.08k
Total expenditure £6.13k £7.19k £14.40k £16.50k £3.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A