CLAPHAM PARK PROJECT

Charity number: 1135137
Charity reporting is up to date (60 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 April 2021 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 01 April 2021 60 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 09 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 24 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 21 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 21 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 15 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 02 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 31 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 19 December 2016 On time Download