THE WANDSWORTH PRISON VISITORS' CENTRE ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 02 July 2004: Standard registration
- 18 June 2007: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THE WANDSWORTH VISITORS' CENTRE ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2005 | 30/04/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £71.36k | £123.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.99k | £131.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2006 | 03 October 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2006 | 03 October 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 24 November 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 24 November 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 APRIL 2004
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY AMONGST, AND PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE MENTAL HEALTH OF WIVES, PARTNERS, FAMILIES, CHILDREN AND DEPENDANTS OF PERSONS WHO HAVE SUFFERED A LEGAL RESTRICTION OF THEIR LIBERTY, AND WHO ARE DETAINED AT WANDSWORTH PRISON IN PARTICULAR, BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VISITORS' CENTRE OFFERING ADVICE AND INFORMATION SERVICES AND PLAY FACILITIES FOR CHILDREN.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window