Governing document Alex, The Leukodystrophy Charity

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01/06/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/08/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/07/2013 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 24/11/2014 as amended on 13 May 2019
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS OF PEOPLE WITH ADRENOLEUKODYSTROPHY AND OTHER LEUKODYSTROPHIES AND THEIR PARENTS AND CARERS. 2. TO PROMOTE MEDICAL RESEARCH INTO ADRENOLEUKODYSTROPHY, ADRENOMYELONEUROPATHY AND OTHER LEUKODYSTROPHIES AND THE PUBLICATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC; AND 3. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ADRENOLEUKODYSTROPHY AND OTHER LEUKODYSTROPHIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE WORLDWIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.