Trustees Alex, The Leukodystrophy Charity

Charity number: 1106008
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Senai Jimenez Chair 04 May 2020
None on record
Dr John Livingston Trustee 15 May 2022
None on record
Iraj Idafar Trustee 06 February 2022
None on record
Dr Gavin Metcalf Trustee 22 March 2021
None on record
Nahed Sarig Trustee 26 August 2020
None on record
Olivia Bostock Trustee 05 February 2020
None on record
Laura Winn Trustee 28 May 2019
None on record
Thea Watkins Trustee 07 February 2019
None on record
Dr Gemma Bridge Trustee 15 February 2018
None on record
LINDA CHRISTINE MILNE Trustee 16 January 2015
None on record