Accounts and annual returns TIGER MOUNTAIN THARU FUND

Charity number: 1105656
Charity reporting is overdue by 98 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 98 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 98 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 September 2022 330 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 December 2020 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 22 December 2020 418 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 05 December 2018 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required