PLYMOUTH KURDISH COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1106624
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £25.05k £10.91k £13.48k £14.51k £16.69k
Total expenditure £16.17k £27.40k £15.74k £17.00k £15.69k
Income from government contracts £0 £900 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.00k £0 N/A N/A N/A