HOLLINWOOD CANAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1104942
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 11 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 29 September 2020 334 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 19 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 19 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required