Accounts and annual returns J-FIRST FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1106403
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022
Annual return 31 March 2021
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021
Annual return 31 March 2020
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020
Annual return 31 March 2019
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019
Annual return 31 March 2018
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018