Governing document THE ROYAL LEAMINGTON SPA ARCHERY SOCIETY

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29/04/2003 AS AMENDED ON 20/04/2004 AS AMENDED ON 04/11/2004 AS AMENDED ON 26/04/2007 AS AMENDED ON 22/04/2010 AS AMENDED ON 12/04/2011 AS AMENDED ON 17/05/2013 AS AMENDED ON 13/11/2015
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND OPPORTUNITIES FOR THE PURSUIT OF ARCHERY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE LOCALLY IN THE LEAMINGTON SPA AREA OF WARWICKSHIRE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.