Accounts and annual returns FLAG (SUPPORTING YOUNGSTERS WITH SPECIAL NEEDS) LIMITED

Charity number: 1104978
Charity reporting is overdue by 21 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 21 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 21 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 09 March 2023 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 30 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window