Dogfen lywodraethu COMMUNITY ACTION FOR INTEGRATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30/03/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/09/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/11/2004 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 18/10/2004 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 10/09/2008 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 15/01/2016
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND NEED AMONGST FRANCOPHONE AFRICANS IMMIGRATION AND ASYLUM SEEKERS (HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS THE BENEFICIARIES) IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING INFORMATION, ADVICE, SUPPORT. 2. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY PROVIDING TRAINING WITH A VIEW TO ENHANCING THE BENEFICIARIES EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES. 3. TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH OF THE BENEFICIARIES. 4. TO PRESERVE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE BENEFICIARIES WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES. 5. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AND ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION ELSEWHERE IN THE WORLD..
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.