MUSLIM HANDS

Charity number: 1105056
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

International relief organisation fundraising in the UK and distributing those funds to educational and humanitarian projects worldwide.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England
  • Afghanistan
  • Albania
  • Bangladesh
  • Burma
  • Central African Republic
  • China
  • Ecuador
  • Egypt
  • Eritrea
  • Ethiopia
  • Ghana
  • Guinea
  • Guinea-bissau
  • Haiti
  • India
  • Indonesia
  • Iran
  • Iraq
  • Jordan
  • Kenya
  • Kosovo
  • Lebanon
  • Liberia
  • Libya
  • Macedonia
  • Malawi
  • Malaysia
  • Mali
  • Mauritania
  • Mauritius
  • Mexico
  • Mozambique
  • Nepal
  • Niger
  • Nigeria
  • Occupied Palestinian Territories
  • Pakistan
  • Philippines
  • Russia
  • Rwanda
  • Senegal
  • Sierra Leone
  • Somalia
  • South Africa
  • Spain
  • Sri Lanka
  • Sudan
  • Syria
  • Tajikistan
  • Tanzania
  • The Gambia
  • Togo
  • Turkey
  • Uganda
  • Yemen

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 July 2004: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SYED LAKHTE HASSANAIN Chair
MUSLIM CHARITIES FORUM
Received: On time
MOHAMMED ZAMEER Trustee 15 December 2020
None on record
ABDUL QUDEIR KHAN Trustee 15 December 2020
None on record
MOHAMMAD ARSHAD JAMIL Trustee 01 January 2013
None on record
SAHIBZADA GHULAM JEELANI Trustee
None on record
SAFFI ULLAH Trustee
None on record
PIR MUHAMMAD AMIN-UL-HASNAT SHAH Trustee
None on record
Dr MUSHARRAF HUSSAIN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £19.10m £21.14m £22.77m £32.46m £37.13m
Total expenditure £14.89m £21.21m £21.57m £27.65m £33.47m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £19.06m £21.10m £22.73m £32.42m £37.10m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £37.91k £34.38k £37.81k £34.39k £29.33k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £12.37m £18.65m £18.99m £24.66m £30.63m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.52m £2.55m £2.58m £3.00m £2.84m
Expenditure - Governance £486.11k £0 £446.39k £537.47k £526.50k
Expenditure - Grants institution £10.14m £0 £16.22m £21.85m £26.69m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Own use assets £1.43m £1.41m £1.37m £1.30m £1.25m
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £9.84m £9.79m £11.30m £17.72m £20.47m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £497.86k £497.76k £765.28k £2.31m £1.36m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 13 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 13 October 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 22 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 22 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 29 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 29 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 21 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 21 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Muslim Hands
148-164 Gregory Boulevard
NOTTINGHAM
NG7 5JE
Phone:
004401159117222