WORD TO THE WORLD MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of Christian religion Distribution of Christian literature
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- West Sussex
- Antigua And Barbuda
- Argentina
- Senegal
- Seychelles
- Spain
Governance
- 23 July 2004: Standard registration
- 13 June 2023: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £6.26k | £6.88k | £15.26k | £13.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.49k | £14.83k | £13.68k | £14.94k | £14.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 18 February 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 18 February 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 08 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 09 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 01 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 15 APRIL 2004
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH BY THE PROCLAMATION AND FURTHERANCE OF THE GOSPEL OF GOD CONCERNING HIS SON JESUS CHRIST OUR LORD AND THE PREACHING AND TEACHING OF THE UNCOMPROMISED WORD OF GOD IN ALL PARTS OF THE WORLD CONSISTENTLY WITH THE DOCTRINES AND BELIEFS SET FORTH IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO ("THE DOCTRINES") AND IN PARTICULAR TO SPANISH-SPEAKING PEOPLE IN EUROPE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE UK, SPAIN, AFRICA, SPANISH-SPEAKING SOUTH AMERICAN COUNTRIES AND INDIA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window