CHECKPOINT CHRISTIAN YOUTH TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Working in schools in Herefordshire and Surrounding areas
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 26 July 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROGER JOHN WIEBKIN | Chair | 20 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Jane Parsonage | Trustee | 13 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
MARK ROBERTS | Trustee | 13 February 2025 |
|
|||||
Sharon Roberts | Trustee | 13 February 2025 |
|
|||||
Bethany Sarah Helen Stark | Trustee | 13 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Mansell | Trustee | 02 February 2017 |
|
|||||
Tirzah Jones | Trustee | 05 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
LORNA RUTH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.27k | £28.77k | £25.30k | £49.64k | £39.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.07k | £29.50k | £30.44k | £32.24k | £41.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 12 JULY 2004 as amended on 20 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
A. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO PARTICULARLY AMONGST CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE SCHOOLS, COLLEGES, OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS, CHURCHES AND CHRISTIAN ORGANISATIONS IN HEREFORDSHIRE AND ELSEWHERE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT B. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES IN THE SAID LOCALITY AND ELSEWHERE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT
Area of benefit
HEREFORDSHIRE AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
FAIRACRE
CANON PYON
HEREFORD
HR4 8PL
- Phone:
- 01568613740
- Email:
- mark@checkpoint.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window