BRIAN MURTAGH CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1105099
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/01/2016 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020
Total gross income £140.25k £644.58k £436.41k £689.31k £384.11k
Total expenditure £684.02k £481.54k £567.54k £622.71k £418.67k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A £644.58k N/A £689.31k N/A
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £481.54k N/A £620.07k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 N/A £2.64k N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £4.28k N/A £15.61k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £477.27k N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A £208 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A