Trustees CROCHAN CELF
Charity number: 1105121
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Gwynedd Roberts | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elinor Gray-Williams | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emyr Prys Davies | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nayema Khan Williams | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Yasmin Khan | Trustee | 12 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Delyth Eluned Hughes | Trustee | 05 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Walis George | Trustee | 19 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gerallt Llewelyn Jones | Trustee | 19 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ellen Thirsk | Trustee | 04 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dewi Rhys Jones | Trustee | 07 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
WYN ROBERTS | Trustee | 05 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Meirion Macintyre Huws | Trustee | 19 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Iestyn Harris | Trustee | 19 January 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.