HULLBRIDGE SPORTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1105274
Charity reporting is up to date (16 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £100.40k £69.74k £77.50k £97.95k £140.20k
Total expenditure £114.64k £83.93k £65.74k £107.62k £170.64k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A