Accounts and annual returns YAD VEACHISOMOCH L'CHAIM

Charity number: 1105231
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2021 28 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 28 March 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 11 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 11 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2019 17 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 17 March 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2018 19 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 19 February 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2017 06 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 06 March 2018 On time Download Open in new window