Accounts and annual returns FARASSA

Charity number: 1106899
Charity reporting is overdue by 43 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2023 Overdue Overdue by 43 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Overdue Overdue by 43 days
Annual return 30 June 2022 10 May 2023 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 06 June 2022 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 12 May 2021 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 12 May 2021 377 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required