Accounts and annual returns YORKSHIRE UNIVERSITIES

Charity number: 1109200
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 02 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 02 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 30 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 30 March 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 20 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 20 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2018 01 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 01 March 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2017 30 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 30 November 2017 On time Download Open in new window