Trustees YORKSHIRE UNIVERSITIES
Charity number: 1109200

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor David Neil Petley | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
PROFESSOR CHARLES EGBU | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Joe Wilson | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Simone Elisabeth Buitendijk | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Karen Bryan | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Charlie Adrian Jeffery | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Shirley Congdon | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Koenraad Lamberts | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Christopher Roy Husbands | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|||||||
Professor Peter Robert Slee | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Simone Wonnacott | Trustee | 05 April 2013 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Robert Anthony Cryan CBE FIET | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.