THE WATFORD BAND

Charity number: 1105301
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 November 2020 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 18 March 2020 139 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 27 March 2019 147 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 03 December 2017 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 08 December 2016 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)