THE WATFORD BAND

Charity number: 1105301
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £8.49k £12.99k £11.62k £10.18k £12.80k
Total expenditure £9.25k £12.23k £10.35k £10.78k £7.59k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A