CHILDRENS ARTHRITIS TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE TRUST MAKES GRANTS TO HOSPITALS TO IMPROVE THE CARE AND TREATMENT OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE SUFFERING WITH ARTHRITIS. IT ALSO MAKES GRANTS TO SUPPORT RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES AND TREATMENT OF ARTHRITIS IN CHILDREN.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 November 2004: Standard registration
- 20 May 2019: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 20 May 2019: Funds transferred to 1134859 THE NATIONAL RHEUMATOID ARTHRITIS SOCIETY
- CAT (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2014 | 30/06/2015 | 30/06/2016 | 30/06/2017 | 30/06/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.96k | £14.34k | £13.51k | £12.05k | £4.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £780 | £8.29k | £4.13k | £16.02k | £2.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2018 | 09 May 2019 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2017 | 14 March 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2016 | 13 March 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2015 | 01 February 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 4 NOVEMBER 2004.
Charitable objects
(1) TO RELIEVE CHILDREN WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM ARTHRITIS (2) TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES AND TREATMENT OF JUVENILE IDIOPATHIC ARTHRITIS AND THE PUBLIC DISSEMINATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window