Financial history AGE UK MERTON

Charity number: 1105384
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £640.12k £653.67k £652.71k £784.17k £862.63k
Total expenditure £645.21k £665.18k £615.74k £685.57k £753.52k
Income from government contracts £31.86k £40.00k £83.93k £84.57k £67.78k
Income from government grants £88.95k £70.02k £114.34k £150.57k £290.41k
Income - Donations and legacies £36.15k £55.29k £47.93k £116.13k £88.84k
Income - Other trading activities £4.06k £7.95k £0 £11.98k £0
Income - Charitable activities £598.21k £589.09k £603.24k £654.21k £772.59k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.71k £1.34k £1.53k £1.84k £1.20k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £5.86k £1.00k £0 £71.87k £36.60k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £625.39k £653.97k £604.79k £682.59k £750.07k
Expenditure - Raising funds £19.82k £11.22k £10.95k £2.98k £3.46k
Expenditure - Governance £23.29k £15.84k £0 £10.67k £8.17k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0