Trustees AGE UK MERTON

Charity number: 1105384
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Tobin Byers Chair 12 November 2020
None on record
Richard Martin Batson Trustee 24 November 2021
None on record
Katherine Murray Trustee 24 November 2021
None on record
BRIAN PATRICK Dillon Trustee 30 November 2020
MERTON VOLUNTARY SERVICE COUNCIL
Received: On time
Dr Hannah Ariadne Behrendt Trustee 21 November 2019
None on record
Altaf Moledina Trustee 21 November 2019
None on record
Shuile Syeda Trustee 08 January 2018
None on record
Gerald Willabus Trustee 06 November 2017
None on record
EILEEN NUTTING Trustee 15 January 2013
None on record
CLARE GUMMETT Trustee
None on record