BURKINA COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1106192
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2012 Overdue Overdue by 3017 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Overdue Overdue by 3017 days
Annual return 31 March 2011 Overdue Overdue by 3383 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Overdue Overdue by 3383 days
Annual return 31 March 2010 Overdue Overdue by 3748 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Overdue Overdue by 3748 days
Annual return 31 March 2009 Overdue Overdue by 4113 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Overdue Overdue by 4113 days
Annual return 31 March 2008 16 October 2008 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 31 May 2009 120 days late