BURKINA COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1106192
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008
Total gross income £43.00k £44.00k £29.93k £57.41k £57.41k
Total expenditure £43.00k £40.00k £28.49k £45.63k £45.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A