ARAB ADVICE BUREAU LTD

Charity number: 1106752
Charity reporting is up to date (49 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 18 August 2020 49 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 02 June 2020 338 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 18 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 26 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 18 May 2018 322 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 31 May 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2015 Overdue Overdue by 1778 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 22 March 2016 On time Download