ARAB ADVICE BUREAU LTD

Charity number: 1106752
Charity reporting is up to date (49 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £119.40k £61.13k £49.06k £22.92k £22.23k
Total expenditure £116.28k £58.54k £50.20k £37.42k £31.34k
Income from government contracts N/A £15.29k £0 £4.80k N/A
Income from government grants N/A £25.29k £22.47k N/A £1.60k