CHRISTIAN AID

Charity number: 1105851
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Martin JOHNSTONE Trustee 29 October 2019 None on record
MARGARET ANNE SWINSON Trustee 17 October 2017
CHRISTIAN AID Received: On time
LIVERPOOL HOPE UNIVERSITY Received: On time
ANGLICAN CONSULTATIVE COUNCIL Received: On time
THE ARCHBISHOP OF CANTERBURY'S ANGLICAN COMMUNION FUND Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MATTHEW AND ST. JAMES MOSSLEY HILL, LIVERPOOL Received: On time
FRANCIS NEILSON TRUST FUND
THE FRIENDS OF THE ARCHBISHOP OF CANTERBURY'S ANGLICAN COMMUNION FUND Received: On time
HAZEL BAIRD Trustee 19 October 2016 None on record
Jennifer Cormack Trustee 01 November 2013
CHRISTIAN AID Received: On time
THE BRITISH AND IRISH CHURCHES TRUST LIMITED Received: On time
Dr John Tucker Mugabi SENTAMU Trustee 29 July 2021 None on record
Dr Rowan Douglas Williams Chair 29 April 2013
INSPIRE DIALOGUE FOUNDATION Received: 16 days late
DR JOHN MILLINGTON SCHOLARSHIP CHARITY Received: On time
Mark Andrew CURRIE Trustee 30 October 2018
CHRISTIAN AID Received: On time
PIPPA GREENSLADE Trustee 13 October 2015
CHRISTIAN AID Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH, CHORLEYWOOD Received: 16 days late
Rev NAN POWELL-DAVIES Trustee 29 October 2019
CHRISTIAN AID Received: On time
CRONFA MARI A PRYDERI AR GYFER PATAGONIA DE AMERICA Received: On time
Nicholas Hamilton Moberly Trustee 30 October 2018
CHRISTIAN AID Received: On time
MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS INTERNATIONAL FEDERATION Received: On time
MUKAMI MCCRUM Trustee 31 January 2017 None on record
BALACHANDREN GNANAPRAGASAM Trustee 01 November 2013
THE BRITISH AND IRISH CHURCHES TRUST LIMITED Received: On time
WELL-BEING (SRI LANKA) Received: On time
METHODIST HOMES Received: On time
SOUTHWARK AND DEPTFORD CIRCUIT Received: On time
VALERIE TRAORE Trustee 13 October 2015
CHRISTIAN AID Received: On time
Rev Sarah Elizabeth HUGHES Trustee 30 October 2018
CHRISTIAN AID Received: On time
ALEXIS CHAPMAN Trustee 01 November 2013
CHRISTIAN AID Received: On time
THE BORDER CONSORTIUM Received: On time