Financial history ROCK OF SALVATION CHRISTIAN CENTRE

Charity number: 1105548
Charity reporting is overdue by 1715 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2011 31/07/2012 31/07/2013 31/07/2014 31/07/2015
Total gross income £70.33k £49.04k £48.87k £22.41k £25.16k
Total expenditure £57.33k £46.23k £48.52k £44.86k £31.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0