AFIRM
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Delivering help and sustenance at the point of need throughout India .... by providing funding for housing, food, clothing, medical treatment and schooling to poor and needy children and old people. By providing advice and information on all aspects of care.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- India
Governance
- 20 August 2004: Standard registration
- 05 June 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
- AFIRM UK (Working name)
- AFIRM-INDIA (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2018 | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.19k | £32.22k | £23.58k | £30.01k | £15.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.58k | £59.63k | £19.72k | £30.56k | £31.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 08 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 19 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | 18 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | 18 January 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 AUGUST 2004
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN WHO ARE IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, ORPHANS IN THE BANGALORE DISTRICT IN SOUTH INDIA THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A CHILDREN'S HOME, CARE SERVICES, FINANCIAL, EDUCATIONAL AND MEDICAL SUPPORT. TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, SICKNESS AND POOR HEALTH AMONGST ELDERLY PEOPLE IN THE BANGALORE DISTRICT OF SOUTH INDIA THROUGH THE PROVISION OF HOUSING, CARE SERVICES, FINANCIAL AND MEDICAL SUPPORT. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN BANGALORE, SOUTH INDIA FOR THE BENEFIT OF BELIEVERS THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, CELEBRATIONS AND SERVICES TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT CHRISTIAN FAITH
Area of benefit
OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window