THE ATAXIA-TELANGIECTASIA SOCIETY

Charity number: 1105528
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 15 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 15 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 23 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 23 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 11 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 11 July 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 05 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 05 July 2016 On time Download