ST ANTONY'S COLLEGE KAYTS ALUMNI ASSOCIATION OF EUROPE (SACKAAEU)

Charity number: 1106466
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 21 January 2021 356 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 02 April 2018 61 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 31 August 2017 212 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required