The Gemmological Association of Great Britain

Charity number: 1109555
Charity reporting is up to date (39 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 09 December 2021 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 09 December 2021 39 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 11 November 2019 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 11 November 2019 11 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 17 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 17 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 25 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 25 September 2017 On time Download