The Gemmological Association of Great Britain

Charity number: 1109555
Charity reporting is up to date (39 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £3.48m £3.61m £3.71m £3.76m £2.80m
Total expenditure £3.02m £3.33m £3.61m £3.83m £2.92m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £68.45k
Income - Donations and legacies £915 £2.77k £890 £4.83k £172
Income - Other trading activities £326.63k £299.82k £994.59k £1.38m £873.44k
Income - Charitable activities £3.15m £3.30m £2.71m £2.37m £1.86m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £68.45k
Income - Legacies £915 £2.77k £890 £4.83k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.72m £2.95m £2.83m £2.96m £2.53m
Expenditure - Raising funds £300.91k £0 £0 £0 £341.71k
Expenditure - Governance £19.20k £19.52k £41.30k £33.03k £38.94k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £377.01k £780.37k £876.04k £53.00k