CANCER LIFELINE SOUTH WEST LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To give support to anyone affected by cancer (patients or carer) through the provision of short, residential breaks which include counselling, support and advice and which are free of charge to all-comers. Under exceptional circumstances, support may be provided on a one-to-one basis and/or online.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cornwall
- Devon
Governance
- 25 January 2005: Standard registration
- LIFELINE RESOURCES (Working name)
- LIFELINE RESOURCES LTD (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lisa Jane Lea-Weston | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Juliet Roseanne Strachan | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kathleen Elizabeth McCormick | Trustee | 13 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Donna Cook | Trustee | 10 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.53k | £9.71k | £13.92k | £11.72k | £11.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.84k | £4.77k | £9.33k | £14.13k | £18.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £500 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 JULY 2004 AS AMENDED 20 DECEMBER 2004 AND 20 AUGUST 2010 BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME.
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, PARTICULARLY THOSE SUFFERING FROM CANCER (INCLUDING PERSONS IN REMISSION) AND THEIR FAMILIES BY THE PROVISION OF HOLISTIC AND OTHER THERAPY TREATMENTS INCLUDING TRADITIONAL, ALTERNATIVE AND COMPLIMENTARY THERAPIES AND TREATMENTS. 2. TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE HEALTH OF THOSE SUFFERING FROM CANCER AND THEIR FAMILIES BY THE PROVISION OF A COUNSELLING, ADVICE AND SUPPORT SERVICE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Palace Mill
Rock Road
Chudleigh
NEWTON ABBOT
Devon
TQ13 0JJ
- Phone:
- 07889970986
- Email:
- info@cancer-lifeline.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window