WHEATLEY HILL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1105615
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 25 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 21 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 07 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 27 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 26 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 20 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 09 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 19 July 2016 On time Download