Trustees LEEDS LIEDER +
Charity number: 1105803

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KATHLEEN MARGARET EVANS | Chair | 18 September 2014 |
|
|||||||
Peter John Brathwaite FRSA | Trustee | 17 February 2022 |
|
|||||||
MARGARET JOSEPHINE PULLAN | Trustee | 21 July 2021 |
|
|||||||
Cllr Jane Dowson | Trustee | 01 February 2019 |
|
|
||||||
JILLIAN LESLEY JOHNSON MBE | Trustee | 17 March 2016 |
|
|||||||
HELEN STEPHENS | Trustee | 18 September 2014 |
|
|
||||||
Robert Holt | Trustee | 03 April 2014 |
|
|
||||||
Dr George Kennaway | Trustee | 03 April 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.