CANAAN TRUST

Charity number: 1105657
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 25 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 20 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 19 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 30 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 04 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 30 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 08 November 2016 On time Download