CANAAN TRUST

Charity number: 1105657
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £235.06k £359.25k £239.30k £303.09k £325.42k
Total expenditure £235.58k £237.67k £243.02k £277.86k £301.18k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.00k £0 N/A N/A N/A