CANAAN TRUST

Charity number: 1105657
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Timothy Broad Trustee 26 March 2014 None on record
Teresa Jane Hopkins Trustee 27 November 2019 None on record
DIANNA JEAN ROSS Trustee None on record
Alan Goulden Trustee 15 July 2015 None on record
DAVID GEE Chair 04 January 2013 None on record
TREVOR JONES Trustee 04 November 2015 None on record